Webthe IBL board from July 2002, and the IBP board from August 2011. He has served on the board of Investec Asset Management from November 2013 and remains on the board of the newly listed Ninety One as a non-executive director. Fani was a founding member of the private investment group Kagiso Trust Investments Limited (now Kagiso Tiso WebMar 25, 2024 · Posted: Mar 25, 2024 4:22 am. Reggie Fils-Aimé has retired from GameStop's board of directors, just one year after he joined the company. Fils-Aimé is one of eight …
Board of Directors REI Co-op
WebApr 8, 2024 · The information, exposed on social media sites, also shows that U.S. intelligence services are eavesdropping on important allies. Send any friend a story As a … WebDec 7, 2024 · Letter to the Board of Directors. Download Letter PDF. December 7, 2024. Board of Directors Exxon Mobil Corporation 5959 Las Colinas Boulevard Irving, Texas 75039 Attention: Darren Woods, Chairman & CEO. Ladies & Gentlemen, harworth population
Governance & Leadership - RGE (Royal Golden Eagle) Group
WebFeb 18, 2024 · February 18, 2024 by Olivier Dellacherie - Talent4Boards. – UK, London – McBride plc (LON: MCB) today announced the appointment of Regi Aalstad to its Board as a Non-Executive Director with effect from 14 March 2024. Regi will also join serve the Nomination, Remuneration, and Audit & Risk Committees. “Regi brings extensive … WebBoard of Directors. Martin Komischke Chairman. Urs Leinhäuser Vice-Chairman. Maria Heriz Member. Libo Zhang Member. Hermann Gerlinger ... CFO . Urs Gantner Executive Vice … WebAfter graduating from Universidade de Sao Paulo as an electrical engineer, Reginaldo started his journey at Unilever Brazil as a trainee in 1991. Just two years later, he was responsible for building a new factory and the production of a new category – powder detergents. Since then, through leadership positions across Unilever’s supply ... books to read about history